THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:32:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 55 John Street
Metro Hall
Toronto Public Health
11th floor
Toronto Ontario M5V 0C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163387600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Lakeridge Health Clarington
ER Department
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
Phone: (905) 623-3331
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V. Dubey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Dubey (CPSO#: 76215 )
Business Address: 10th Floor
277 Victoria Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W2
(416) 397-4696
Business Address: Lakeridge Health Clarington
Emergency Department
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
(905) 623-3331

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 55 John Street
Metro Hall
Toronto Public Health
11th floor
Toronto Ontario M5V 0C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163387600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Lakeridge Health Clarington
ER Department
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
Phone: (905) 623-3331
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V. Dubey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Dubey (CPSO#: 76215 )
Business Address: 10th Floor
277 Victoria Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W2
(416) 397-4696
Business Address: Lakeridge Health Clarington
Emergency Department
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
(905) 623-3331

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VINITA DUBEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUBEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VINITA DUBEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUBEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001