THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:18:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 210-1885 Glenanna Rd
Pickering ON L1V 6R6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-492-0333
Fax: 905-420-8523

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. G. DeSa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. DeSa (CPSO#: 76226 )
Business Address: 1885 Glenanna Rd
Suite 210
Pickering ON L1V 6R6
9054205776

Corporation Name: Michelle DeSa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 210-1885 Glenanna Rd
Pickering ON L1V 6R6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-492-0333
Fax: 905-420-8523

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. G. DeSa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. DeSa (CPSO#: 76226 )
Business Address: 1885 Glenanna Rd
Suite 210
Pickering ON L1V 6R6
9054205776

Corporation Name: Michelle DeSa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE GWEN DESA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE GWEN DESA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Feb 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001