THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:32:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 323-6013
Fax: (416) 323-6534

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 13 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Sahgal & Kim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kim (CPSO#: 76234 ) Dr. A. Sahgal (CPSO#: 76245 )
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-6013
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue T-Wing
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4834

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 323-6013
Fax: (416) 323-6534

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 13 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Sahgal & Kim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kim (CPSO#: 76234 ) Dr. A. Sahgal (CPSO#: 76245 )
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-6013
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue T-Wing
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4834

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANDRA ANN KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANDRA ANN KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001