THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:31:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Homewood Health Centre
Department of Psychiatry
150 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 6K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 824-1010
Extension: 32391
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge Ontario N1R3G2
Phone: 519-740-4900
Fax: 519-740-4936

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Oct 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Homewood Health Centre
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Linda McColl Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. McColl (CPSO#: 76235 )
Business Address: 700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
(519) 621-2330
Business Address: 115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
(519) 822-5350
Business Address: Homewood
Department of Psychiatry
150 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 6K9
(519) 824-1010

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Homewood Health Centre
Department of Psychiatry
150 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 6K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 824-1010
Extension: 32391
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge Ontario N1R3G2
Phone: 519-740-4900
Fax: 519-740-4936

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Oct 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Homewood Health Centre
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Linda McColl Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. McColl (CPSO#: 76235 )
Business Address: 700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
(519) 621-2330
Business Address: 115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
(519) 822-5350
Business Address: Homewood
Department of Psychiatry
150 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 6K9
(519) 824-1010

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDA CHERYL PATRICIA MCCOLL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCOLL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDA CHERYL PATRICIA MCCOLL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCOLL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001