THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 03:55:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 1C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-8469
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Ottawa Hospital Academic Family
Health Team
210 Melrose Ave
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4K7
Phone: (613) 761-4334
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anna N. Wilkinson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wilkinson (CPSO#: 76240 )
Business Address: 210 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4K7
(613) 761-4334
Business Address: Ottawa Regional Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 1C4
(613) 737-8469

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 1C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-8469
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Ottawa Hospital Academic Family
Health Team
210 Melrose Ave
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4K7
Phone: (613) 761-4334
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anna N. Wilkinson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wilkinson (CPSO#: 76240 )
Business Address: 210 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4K7
(613) 761-4334
Business Address: Ottawa Regional Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 1C4
(613) 737-8469

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNA NATALIE WILKINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILKINSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNA NATALIE WILKINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILKINSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001