THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:33:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: Roy, Natalie Nanette (Used Until: 28 May 2003)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: City of Lakes Family Health Team
Pioneer Manor Site
Unit C
960 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury Ontario P3A 2T4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 560-1018
Fax: (705) 566-7617

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natalie Goodale Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Goodale (CPSO#: 76244 )
Business Address: City of Lakes Family Health Team
Pioneer Manor Site
Unit C
960 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury Ontario P3A 2T4
(705) 560-1018

General Information

Former Name: Roy, Natalie Nanette (Used Until: 28 May 2003)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: City of Lakes Family Health Team
Pioneer Manor Site
Unit C
960 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury Ontario P3A 2T4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 560-1018
Fax: (705) 566-7617

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natalie Goodale Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Goodale (CPSO#: 76244 )
Business Address: City of Lakes Family Health Team
Pioneer Manor Site
Unit C
960 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury Ontario P3A 2T4
(705) 560-1018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATALIE NANETTE GOODALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOODALE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATALIE NANETTE GOODALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOODALE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001