THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:41:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 18939 Leslie Street
East Gwillimbury Ontario L0G 1V0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058959777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Samaha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Aug 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Samaha (CPSO#: 76246 )
Business Address: 16880 Yonge Street
Suite 1
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 0A3
(905) 895-9777
Business Address: 214-16775 Yonge St
Newmarket ON L3Y 8J4
Business Address: 18939 Leslie Street
East Gwillimbury Ontario L0G 1V0
9058959777

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 18939 Leslie Street
East Gwillimbury Ontario L0G 1V0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058959777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Samaha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Aug 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Samaha (CPSO#: 76246 )
Business Address: 16880 Yonge Street
Suite 1
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 0A3
(905) 895-9777
Business Address: 214-16775 Yonge St
Newmarket ON L3Y 8J4
Business Address: 18939 Leslie Street
East Gwillimbury Ontario L0G 1V0
9058959777

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMAR SAMAHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMAHA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMAR SAMAHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMAHA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001