THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:28:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 39 Campus Trail
Unit 5
Huntsville Ontario P1H 0E5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 789-4377
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Allison Small Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Small (CPSO#: 76248 )
Business Address: 203 - 348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H8
(705) 789-3005
Business Address: 5-39 Campus Trail
Huntsville ON P1H 0E5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 39 Campus Trail
Unit 5
Huntsville Ontario P1H 0E5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 789-4377
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Allison Small Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Small (CPSO#: 76248 )
Business Address: 203 - 348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H8
(705) 789-3005
Business Address: 5-39 Campus Trail
Huntsville ON P1H 0E5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLISON MARY SMALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMALL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLISON MARY SMALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMALL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001