THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:23:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 602-2 Gurdwara Rd
Nepean ON K2E 1A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1 (613) 714-9855
Fax: No Information Available
Address: unit 36-747 Silver Seven Road
Ottawa Ontario K2V 0A1
Phone: 6137144666
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 713 Montreal Rd
Montfort Hospital
Internal Medicine
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Phone: 1 (613) 746-4621
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 17 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas Psarras Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Psarras (CPSO#: 76258 )
Business Address: 713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 602-2 Gurdwara Rd
Nepean ON K2E 1A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1 (613) 714-9855
Fax: No Information Available
Address: unit 36-747 Silver Seven Road
Ottawa Ontario K2V 0A1
Phone: 6137144666
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 713 Montreal Rd
Montfort Hospital
Internal Medicine
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Phone: 1 (613) 746-4621
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 17 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas Psarras Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Psarras (CPSO#: 76258 )
Business Address: 713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS ELIAS PSARRAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PSARRAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS ELIAS PSARRAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PSARRAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001