THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:04:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: Chan, Edward See-Ming (Used Until: 10 Sep 2020) Chan, Edward See-Ming (Used Until: 16 Oct 2003)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Hospital
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Extension: 6619
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 09 Oct 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 09 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jun 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Chan (CPSO#: 76263 )
Business Address: Southlake Regional Hospital
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521

General Information

Former Name: Chan, Edward See-Ming (Used Until: 10 Sep 2020) Chan, Edward See-Ming (Used Until: 16 Oct 2003)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Hospital
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Extension: 6619
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 09 Oct 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 09 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jun 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Chan (CPSO#: 76263 )
Business Address: Southlake Regional Hospital
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWARD SE-MING CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWARD SE-MING CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001