THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:42:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: Hyland, Meaghen Joanne (Used Until: 06 Nov 2006)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mt Sinai Hosp., 600 University Ave
rm 1276, 12th Floor
Marvelle Koffler Breast Cen, TO, ON
M5G1XS
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-524-0514
Fax: 416-946-6564
Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Phone: (647) 524-0514
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 610 University Ave.
Toronto Ontario M5G2M9
Phone: 647-524-0514
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Beresford Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 May 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Beresford (CPSO#: 76273 )
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(647) 524-0514
Business Address: 610 University Avenue
Room 3-962
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(647) 524-0514
Business Address: 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(647) 524-0514
Business Address: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(647) 524-0514

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Apr 2017

General Information

Former Name: Hyland, Meaghen Joanne (Used Until: 06 Nov 2006)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mt Sinai Hosp., 600 University Ave
rm 1276, 12th Floor
Marvelle Koffler Breast Cen, TO, ON
M5G1XS
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-524-0514
Fax: 416-946-6564
Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Phone: (647) 524-0514
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 610 University Ave.
Toronto Ontario M5G2M9
Phone: 647-524-0514
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Beresford Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 May 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Beresford (CPSO#: 76273 )
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(647) 524-0514
Business Address: 610 University Avenue
Room 3-962
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(647) 524-0514
Business Address: 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(647) 524-0514
Business Address: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(647) 524-0514

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Apr 2017

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEAGHEN JOANNE BERESFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERESFORD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEAGHEN JOANNE BERESFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERESFORD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001