THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 04:33:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Radiology
St Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6000
Extension: 64644
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 104-450 Central Avenue
London Ontario N6B 2E8
Phone: (519) 672-5270
Extension: 7051
Fax: (519) 672-4459

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site Walkerton
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
Four Counties Health Services Newbury
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Durham-Memorial Site Durham
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site Chesley
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

HOSPITAL: Four Counties Health Services
LOCATION: Newbury

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Durham-Memorial Site
LOCATION: Durham

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site
LOCATION: Chesley

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Z. M. Kassam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Apr 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Kassam (CPSO#: 76281 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Radiology
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6035

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Radiology
St Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6000
Extension: 64644
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 104-450 Central Avenue
London Ontario N6B 2E8
Phone: (519) 672-5270
Extension: 7051
Fax: (519) 672-4459

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site Walkerton
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
Four Counties Health Services Newbury
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Durham-Memorial Site Durham
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site Chesley
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

HOSPITAL: Four Counties Health Services
LOCATION: Newbury

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Durham-Memorial Site
LOCATION: Durham

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site
LOCATION: Chesley

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Z. M. Kassam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Apr 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Kassam (CPSO#: 76281 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Radiology
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6035

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZAHRA MANSUR KASSAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASSAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZAHRA MANSUR KASSAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASSAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 May 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001