THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:33:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: Kumar, Parul (Used Until: 07 Sep 2003)
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Avenue W
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-4466
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Parul Khanna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Khanna (CPSO#: 76284 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-4466

General Information

Former Name: Kumar, Parul (Used Until: 07 Sep 2003)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Avenue W
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-4466
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Parul Khanna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Khanna (CPSO#: 76284 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-4466

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PARUL KHANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHANNA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PARUL KHANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHANNA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Nov 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001