THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:59:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Simcoe Muskoka
Regional Cancer Program
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Extension: 43333
Fax: (705) 739-5619

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 13 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hansen Nay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hansen (CPSO#: 76170 ) Dr. D. Nay (CPSO#: 76285 )
Business Address: 201 Georgian Dr
Simcoe Muskoka Regional Cancer Centre
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
7057395661
Business Address: 302-5 Quarry Ridge Rd
Barrie ON L4M 7G1

Corporation Name: Hansen Nay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Simcoe Muskoka
Regional Cancer Program
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Extension: 43333
Fax: (705) 739-5619

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 13 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hansen Nay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hansen (CPSO#: 76170 ) Dr. D. Nay (CPSO#: 76285 )
Business Address: 201 Georgian Dr
Simcoe Muskoka Regional Cancer Centre
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
7057395661
Business Address: 302-5 Quarry Ridge Rd
Barrie ON L4M 7G1

Corporation Name: Hansen Nay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEREK WAYNE NAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEREK WAYNE NAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Mar 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001