THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:25:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 21 Mount Saint Louis Road West
Moonstone Ontario L0K 1E0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: Call resident Home
Fax: Send to resident Home
Address: 340 Blake St
Barrie ON L4M 1L3
Phone: 7057223611
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 130 Mulcaster St
Barrie ON L4M 3M9
Phone: 7057259119
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3 Concert Way
Barrie Ontario L4N 0M7
Phone: 7058126485
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 110 Lillian Crescent
Barrie Ontario L4N 5H7
Phone: 7057396881
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 70 Wellington Street West
Barrie Ontario L4N 1K4
Phone: 7057284226
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Brooks St
Barrie ON L4N 5L3
Phone: 705 728 2389
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2656 Line 6
Bradford ON L3Z 2A1
Phone: 905 952 2270
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 143 Mary St
Creemore ON L0M 1G0
Phone: 7054663437
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 Kelly Drive
Gravenhurst Ontario P1P 1P3
Phone: 7056873444
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 705 River Road West
Wasaga Beach Ontario L9Z 0R6
Phone: 7054221444
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sacksen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sacksen (CPSO#: 76303 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 21 Mount Saint Louis Road West
Moonstone Ontario L0K 1E0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: Call resident Home
Fax: Send to resident Home
Address: 340 Blake St
Barrie ON L4M 1L3
Phone: 7057223611
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 130 Mulcaster St
Barrie ON L4M 3M9
Phone: 7057259119
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3 Concert Way
Barrie Ontario L4N 0M7
Phone: 7058126485
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 110 Lillian Crescent
Barrie Ontario L4N 5H7
Phone: 7057396881
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 70 Wellington Street West
Barrie Ontario L4N 1K4
Phone: 7057284226
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Brooks St
Barrie ON L4N 5L3
Phone: 705 728 2389
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2656 Line 6
Bradford ON L3Z 2A1
Phone: 905 952 2270
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 143 Mary St
Creemore ON L0M 1G0
Phone: 7054663437
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 Kelly Drive
Gravenhurst Ontario P1P 1P3
Phone: 7056873444
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 705 River Road West
Wasaga Beach Ontario L9Z 0R6
Phone: 7054221444
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sacksen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sacksen (CPSO#: 76303 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALAIN JOSEPH BENOIT SACKSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SACKSEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALAIN JOSEPH BENOIT SACKSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SACKSEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001