THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:09:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Kerala, 1984
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Welland County General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
65 Third Street
Welland Ontario L3B 4W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 732-6111
Extension: 33375
Fax: (905) 732-2651

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Asha Gopinathan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gopinathan (CPSO#: 76304 )
Business Address: 64 Magnolia Lane
Welland Ontario L3B 6H9
9057886450
Business Address: 65 Third Street
Welland Ontario L3B 5X9
9057886450

Corporation Name: Asha Gopinathan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 May 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Kerala, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Welland County General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
65 Third Street
Welland Ontario L3B 4W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 732-6111
Extension: 33375
Fax: (905) 732-2651

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Asha Gopinathan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gopinathan (CPSO#: 76304 )
Business Address: 64 Magnolia Lane
Welland Ontario L3B 6H9
9057886450
Business Address: 65 Third Street
Welland Ontario L3B 5X9
9057886450

Corporation Name: Asha Gopinathan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 May 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASHA GOPINATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOPINATHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASHA GOPINATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOPINATHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Kerala, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Feb 2007
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 23 Feb 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Oct 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Apr 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Feb 2007

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 23 Feb 2007

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2002
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2002

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001