THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/05/25 19:26:02 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3045 Baseline Road
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Geriatrics
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-721-2000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: BruyŠre Continuing Care
lisabeth BruyŠre Hospital
406Y - 75, rue BruyŠre St.
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C7
Phone: 613-562-6262
Extension: 4066
Fax: 613-562-4265

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Jul 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ellen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ellen (CPSO#: 76310 )
Business Address: 406Y-75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C8
(613) 562-6262 Extn: 4066
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Rd
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Geriatric Medicine
A4
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
613-721-2000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3045 Baseline Road
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Geriatrics
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-721-2000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: BruyŠre Continuing Care
lisabeth BruyŠre Hospital
406Y - 75, rue BruyŠre St.
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C7
Phone: 613-562-6262
Extension: 4066
Fax: 613-562-4265

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Jul 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ellen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ellen (CPSO#: 76310 )
Business Address: 406Y-75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C8
(613) 562-6262 Extn: 4066
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Rd
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Geriatric Medicine
A4
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
613-721-2000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUTH LESLEY BRAMME ELLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELLEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUTH LESLEY BRAMME ELLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELLEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001