THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:06:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 502
1355 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 738-1584
Fax: (613) 738-9097
Address: 1111 Ghislain St
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3E5
Phone: 613-632-1111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1924-5929 Jeanne D'Arc Blvd South
Orléans Ontario K1C 6V8
Phone: (613) 749-5421
Fax: (613) 830-8211
Address: 60 Cambridge Street North
Ottawa Ontario K1R 7A5
Phone: 613-562-6262
Extension: 2023
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 21 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Maranda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Maranda (CPSO#: 76313 ) Dr. S. Minorgan (CPSO#: 76223 )
Business Address: Suite 502
1355 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
(613) 738-1584
Business Address: 1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3E5
(613) 632-1111
Business Address: 60 Cambridge Street North
Ottawa Ontario K1R 7A5
(613) 562-6262
Business Address: 1924 - 5929 Jeanne D'Arc Boulevard South
Ottawa Ontario K1C 6V8
(613) 749-5421

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 502
1355 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 738-1584
Fax: (613) 738-9097
Address: 1111 Ghislain St
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3E5
Phone: 613-632-1111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1924-5929 Jeanne D'Arc Blvd South
Orléans Ontario K1C 6V8
Phone: (613) 749-5421
Fax: (613) 830-8211
Address: 60 Cambridge Street North
Ottawa Ontario K1R 7A5
Phone: 613-562-6262
Extension: 2023
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 21 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Maranda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Maranda (CPSO#: 76313 ) Dr. S. Minorgan (CPSO#: 76223 )
Business Address: Suite 502
1355 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
(613) 738-1584
Business Address: 1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3E5
(613) 632-1111
Business Address: 60 Cambridge Street North
Ottawa Ontario K1R 7A5
(613) 562-6262
Business Address: 1924 - 5929 Jeanne D'Arc Boulevard South
Ottawa Ontario K1C 6V8
(613) 749-5421

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT CLAUDE MARANDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARANDA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT CLAUDE MARANDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARANDA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 15 Jun 2017
Summary of Decision:
On June 15, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Maranda committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Dr. Maranda is a cardiologist practising in Ottawa. He received his certificate of registration authorizing independent practice in Ontario in 2005 and his specialist qualification in cardiology in 2007. In the relevant years, Dr. Maranda held privileges at The Ottawa Hospital.

Also, in the relevant years, Dr. Maranda was an assistant professor and an “ePorfolio” group leader at the Faculty of Medicine at a University.

Disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct

Ms A was a student in Dr. Maranda’s ePortfolio group. Dr. Maranda’s role as group leader involved meeting with the group of students approximately twice a year to discuss issues associated with the process of completing medical school and preparing their e-portfolios.

Each student in the group had to submit a draft final ePortfolio posting by the required deadline. The ePortfolio class was to be graded by Dr. Maranda on a pass-fail basis. A student would receive a “pass” so long as the student submitted the required postings.

Ms A requested an extension of time for submitting her draft posting. She explained to Dr. Maranda that she was experiencing personal difficulties following the end of a relationship. Dr. Maranda granted the extension. Later, Dr. Maranda offered to meet with Ms A to offer supportive advice.

Dr. Maranda and Ms A went for drinks and food and discussed Ms A’s personal issues as well as her progress in obtaining a residency placement. Following their meeting, Ms A texted Dr. Maranda to thank him. Their communications became more frequent and personal after that time.

Dr. Maranda and Ms A arranged to meet at a pub again a few weeks later. Following their meeting, they returned to Ms A’s apartment and a sexual encounter took place. The next day, Dr. Maranda and Ms A texted back and forth. After several days, Ms A stopped communicating with Dr. Maranda, who continued to send her messages for a few days.


Subsequently, Ms A submitted a complaint about Dr. Maranda to the University.

Dr. Maranda was advised that he was to have no contact with learners, pending review of Ms A’s complaint by the University’s Professionalism Investigation Committee (the “PIC”). The PIC concluded that Dr. Maranda engaged in a personal relationship with a student and that the relationship constituted a breach in professionalism. Although the PIC recommended a supervised reintegration into the learning environment over the course of three years, Dr. Maranda’s academic appointment at the University was terminated.

Dr. Maranda subsequently resigned his privileges at the Ottawa Hospital.

On June 15, 2017, the Committee ordered and directed that:

- The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Maranda’s Certificate of Registration:
a) At his own expense, Dr. Maranda shall successfully complete the next available course in Understanding Boundaries at Western University within 6 months of the date of this Order

- Dr. Maranda appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
- Dr. Maranda pay costs to the College for a one day hearing in the amount of $5,500.00 within 30 days of the date of this Order.
 
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): June 15, 2017

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 15 Jun 2017
Summary of Decision:
On June 15, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Maranda committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Dr. Maranda is a cardiologist practising in Ottawa. He received his certificate of registration authorizing independent practice in Ontario in 2005 and his specialist qualification in cardiology in 2007. In the relevant years, Dr. Maranda held privileges at The Ottawa Hospital.

Also, in the relevant years, Dr. Maranda was an assistant professor and an “ePorfolio” group leader at the Faculty of Medicine at a University.

Disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct

Ms A was a student in Dr. Maranda’s ePortfolio group. Dr. Maranda’s role as group leader involved meeting with the group of students approximately twice a year to discuss issues associated with the process of completing medical school and preparing their e-portfolios.

Each student in the group had to submit a draft final ePortfolio posting by the required deadline. The ePortfolio class was to be graded by Dr. Maranda on a pass-fail basis. A student would receive a “pass” so long as the student submitted the required postings.

Ms A requested an extension of time for submitting her draft posting. She explained to Dr. Maranda that she was experiencing personal difficulties following the end of a relationship. Dr. Maranda granted the extension. Later, Dr. Maranda offered to meet with Ms A to offer supportive advice.

Dr. Maranda and Ms A went for drinks and food and discussed Ms A’s personal issues as well as her progress in obtaining a residency placement. Following their meeting, Ms A texted Dr. Maranda to thank him. Their communications became more frequent and personal after that time.

Dr. Maranda and Ms A arranged to meet at a pub again a few weeks later. Following their meeting, they returned to Ms A’s apartment and a sexual encounter took place. The next day, Dr. Maranda and Ms A texted back and forth. After several days, Ms A stopped communicating with Dr. Maranda, who continued to send her messages for a few days.


Subsequently, Ms A submitted a complaint about Dr. Maranda to the University.

Dr. Maranda was advised that he was to have no contact with learners, pending review of Ms A’s complaint by the University’s Professionalism Investigation Committee (the “PIC”). The PIC concluded that Dr. Maranda engaged in a personal relationship with a student and that the relationship constituted a breach in professionalism. Although the PIC recommended a supervised reintegration into the learning environment over the course of three years, Dr. Maranda’s academic appointment at the University was terminated.

Dr. Maranda subsequently resigned his privileges at the Ottawa Hospital.

On June 15, 2017, the Committee ordered and directed that:

- The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Maranda’s Certificate of Registration:
a) At his own expense, Dr. Maranda shall successfully complete the next available course in Understanding Boundaries at Western University within 6 months of the date of this Order

- Dr. Maranda appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
- Dr. Maranda pay costs to the College for a one day hearing in the amount of $5,500.00 within 30 days of the date of this Order.
 
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): June 15, 2017

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 03 Nov 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee. Effective: 15 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee. Effective: 15 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 02 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001