THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:25:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 209-460 Springbank Dr
London ON N6J 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-672-1977
Fax: 519-672-6080

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vikram Dalal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Dalal (CPSO#: 76314 )
Business Address: 22262 Mill Road
RR 5
Mount Brydges Ontario N0L 1W0
(519) 264-2800
Business Address: 395 Carrie Street
Strathroy Ontario N7G 3J4
(519) 245-1550
Business Address: 209-460 Springbank Dr
London ON N6J 0A8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 209-460 Springbank Dr
London ON N6J 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-672-1977
Fax: 519-672-6080

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vikram Dalal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Dalal (CPSO#: 76314 )
Business Address: 22262 Mill Road
RR 5
Mount Brydges Ontario N0L 1W0
(519) 264-2800
Business Address: 395 Carrie Street
Strathroy Ontario N7G 3J4
(519) 245-1550
Business Address: 209-460 Springbank Dr
London ON N6J 0A8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VIKRAM DALAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DALAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VIKRAM DALAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DALAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001