THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:25:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: North Colombo Medical College, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALA, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3208A Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1J 2H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 267-6700
Fax: (416) 267-0189
Address: 3340 Lawrence Avenue E
Scarborough Ontario M1H 1A7
Phone: (416) 283-1986
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 65 Greencrest Circuit
Scarborough Ontario M1G3T9
Phone: 4162676700
Fax: 4162670189

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR ASIRWATHAM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Asirwatham (CPSO#: 76325 )
Business Address: 3208 Eglinton Ave E 4162676700

Corporation Name: Dr. Asirwatham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALA, TAMIL
Medical School: North Colombo Medical College, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3208A Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1J 2H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 267-6700
Fax: (416) 267-0189
Address: 3340 Lawrence Avenue E
Scarborough Ontario M1H 1A7
Phone: (416) 283-1986
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 65 Greencrest Circuit
Scarborough Ontario M1G3T9
Phone: 4162676700
Fax: 4162670189

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR ASIRWATHAM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Asirwatham (CPSO#: 76325 )
Business Address: 3208 Eglinton Ave E 4162676700

Corporation Name: Dr. Asirwatham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAMESH INDRANATHAN ASIRWATHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASIRWATHAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAMESH INDRANATHAN ASIRWATHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASIRWATHAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: North Colombo Medical College, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2001
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 2001