THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:37:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
PO Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-4380
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 23 May 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sundeep Shahi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shahi (CPSO#: 76337 )
Business Address: Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4380 Extn: 5489

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
PO Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-4380
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 23 May 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sundeep Shahi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shahi (CPSO#: 76337 )
Business Address: Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4380 Extn: 5489

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUNDEEP SHAHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUNDEEP SHAHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001