THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:22:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Asyut University, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Compass Community Health
Health Centre
438 Hughson Street North
Hamilton Ontario L8L 4N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 523-6611
Fax: (905) 523-8735
Address: Derry Medical Clinic
Unit 16B
3221 Derry Road West
Mississauga Ontario L5N 7L7
Phone: (905) 824-0005
Fax: (905) 824-7440

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abdel Malak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Abdel Malak (CPSO#: 76345 )
Business Address: 363 Colborne Street
Brantford Ontario N3S 3N2
(519) 754-0777
Business Address: Derry Medical Centre
Unit 16B
3221 Derry Road West
Mississauga Ontario L5N 7L7
(905) 824-0005

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, URDU
Medical School: Asyut University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Compass Community Health
Health Centre
438 Hughson Street North
Hamilton Ontario L8L 4N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 523-6611
Fax: (905) 523-8735
Address: Derry Medical Clinic
Unit 16B
3221 Derry Road West
Mississauga Ontario L5N 7L7
Phone: (905) 824-0005
Fax: (905) 824-7440

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abdel Malak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Abdel Malak (CPSO#: 76345 )
Business Address: 363 Colborne Street
Brantford Ontario N3S 3N2
(519) 754-0777
Business Address: Derry Medical Centre
Unit 16B
3221 Derry Road West
Mississauga Ontario L5N 7L7
(905) 824-0005

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAGY MALAK ABDEL MALAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL MALAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAGY MALAK ABDEL MALAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL MALAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Asyut University, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001