THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 06:25:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 305-564 Belmont Ave. W.
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 342-0599
Fax: (519) 342-0895
Address: 911 Queens Blvd.
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 749-6460
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 12 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Chernish Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chernish (CPSO#: 76356 )
Business Address: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4300
Business Address: 911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
(519) 749-6460
Business Address: 305 - 564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5N6
(519) 342-0599

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 305-564 Belmont Ave. W.
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 342-0599
Fax: (519) 342-0895
Address: 911 Queens Blvd.
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 749-6460
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 12 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Chernish Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chernish (CPSO#: 76356 )
Business Address: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4300
Business Address: 911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
(519) 749-6460
Business Address: 305 - 564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5N6
(519) 342-0599

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT NICHOLAS CHERNISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHERNISH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT NICHOLAS CHERNISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHERNISH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001