THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:53:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Fourth Avenue
Niagara Health, Pediatrics
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-407-6607
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin Joseph Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chan (CPSO#: 76358 )
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100
Business Address: Suite 301
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A8
(416) 860-6996
Business Address: 555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-1500
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2200
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
226-577-8065

Corporation Name: Drs. Chan Flanders Lalani & Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 May 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Fourth Avenue
Niagara Health, Pediatrics
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-407-6607
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin Joseph Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chan (CPSO#: 76358 )
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100
Business Address: Suite 301
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A8
(416) 860-6996
Business Address: 555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-1500
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2200
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
226-577-8065

Corporation Name: Drs. Chan Flanders Lalani & Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 May 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN JOSEPH CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN JOSEPH CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001