THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:13:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: Edmonds, Gillian Elizabeth (Used Until: 11 Feb 2003)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 185 Inkerman Street East
Listowel Ontario N4W 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 291-4200
Fax: (519) 291-5947

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham
HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

HOSPITAL: Wingham and District Hospital
LOCATION: Wingham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gillian Edmonds Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Edmonds (CPSO#: 76383 )
Business Address: 185 Inkerman Street East
Listowel Ontario N4W 2N1
(519) 291-4200

General Information

Former Name: Edmonds, Gillian Elizabeth (Used Until: 11 Feb 2003)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 185 Inkerman Street East
Listowel Ontario N4W 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 291-4200
Fax: (519) 291-5947

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham
HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

HOSPITAL: Wingham and District Hospital
LOCATION: Wingham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gillian Edmonds Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Edmonds (CPSO#: 76383 )
Business Address: 185 Inkerman Street East
Listowel Ontario N4W 2N1
(519) 291-4200

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GILLIAN ELIZABETH ANTONIADIS EDMONDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDMONDS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GILLIAN ELIZABETH ANTONIADIS EDMONDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDMONDS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001