THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:24:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3080 Yonge St. Suite 5080
Toronto Ontario M4N 3N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-782-4447
Fax: (416) 782-1284

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Shin (CPSO#: 76470 ) Dr. A. Hong (CPSO#: 76384 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3080 Yonge St. Suite 5080
Toronto Ontario M4N 3N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-782-4447
Fax: (416) 782-1284

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Shin (CPSO#: 76470 ) Dr. A. Hong (CPSO#: 76384 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGIE SUNGYEE HONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGIE SUNGYEE HONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001