THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:04:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga and Queensway sites
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue East
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 106-250 Dundas Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1J2
Phone: 905-275-2273
Fax: 905-275-2297

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 13 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Kundhal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kundhal (CPSO#: 76388 )
Business Address: 75 Watline Avenue
Suites 121 and 125
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 3E5
(905) 813-1100 Extn: 4244
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2200
Business Address: Trillium Health Care Centre
Mississauga Site & Queensway Site
100 Queensway Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100
Business Address: 106-250 Dundas Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1J2
905-275-2273

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga and Queensway sites
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue East
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 106-250 Dundas Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1J2
Phone: 905-275-2273
Fax: 905-275-2297

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 13 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Kundhal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kundhal (CPSO#: 76388 )
Business Address: 75 Watline Avenue
Suites 121 and 125
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 3E5
(905) 813-1100 Extn: 4244
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2200
Business Address: Trillium Health Care Centre
Mississauga Site & Queensway Site
100 Queensway Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100
Business Address: 106-250 Dundas Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1J2
905-275-2273

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIRAN KAUR KUNDHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUNDHAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIRAN KAUR KUNDHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUNDHAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001