THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:18:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 412
1371 Neilson Road
Toronto Ontario M1B 4Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 281-9499
Fax: (416) 283-5705
Address: 2nd Floor
235 Salem Road
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0B1
Phone: (905) 426-8333
Fax: (905) 426-4447

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 21 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raymond T. Yan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Yan (CPSO#: 76397 )
Business Address: Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 284-8131
Business Address: Suite 412
1371 Neilson Road
Toronto Ontario M1B 4Z8
(416) 281-9499
Business Address: Lakeridge Health Ajax Pickering Hospital
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
(905) 683-2320
Business Address: E5- 235 Salem Road
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0B1
(905) 426-8333

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 412
1371 Neilson Road
Toronto Ontario M1B 4Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 281-9499
Fax: (416) 283-5705
Address: 2nd Floor
235 Salem Road
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0B1
Phone: (905) 426-8333
Fax: (905) 426-4447

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 21 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raymond T. Yan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Yan (CPSO#: 76397 )
Business Address: Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 284-8131
Business Address: Suite 412
1371 Neilson Road
Toronto Ontario M1B 4Z8
(416) 281-9499
Business Address: Lakeridge Health Ajax Pickering Hospital
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
(905) 683-2320
Business Address: E5- 235 Salem Road
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0B1
(905) 426-8333

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAYMOND TZE-HENG YAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAYMOND TZE-HENG YAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001