THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:34:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401-3030 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 349-6889
Fax: (647) 349-6885
Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 21 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elaine Yeung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Yeung (CPSO#: 76398 )
Business Address: 401 - 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T3
(647) 349-6889
Business Address: The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 438-2911

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401-3030 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 349-6889
Fax: (647) 349-6885
Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 21 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elaine Yeung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Yeung (CPSO#: 76398 )
Business Address: 401 - 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T3
(647) 349-6889
Business Address: The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 438-2911

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELAINE TIU YEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELAINE TIU YEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001