THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:07:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Emergency Medicine
Scarborough Health Network
Centenary Site
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 281-7270
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 55 Mountainash Road
Osler Hyperbarics and Wound Care
Unit 23
Brampton Ontario L6R 1W4
Phone: 365-747-1470
Fax: 905-216-0594
Address: 17730 Leslie Street
York Hyperbaric Medicine Centre
Suite 112
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 4W4
Phone: 2898039119
Extension: 2
Fax: 9052351277
Address: Southlake Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
596 Davis Dr.
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 330 Highway 7 E
Digestive Health Clinic
Suite 510
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3P8
Phone: 9057075007
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6004
Fax: No Information Available
Address: N/A - House Calls
Maple
Toronto Ontario M6G2L3
Phone: 647-497-7453
Fax: 888-745-0435
Address: 340 College St
Kensington Health Clinic
Suite 601
Toronto ON M5T 3A9
Phone: 4169289511
Fax: 4169289513

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 17 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason K. Yue Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yue (CPSO#: 76401 )
Business Address: Department of Emergency Medicine
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6004
Business Address: Department of Emergency Medicine
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 281-7404
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Emergency Medicine
Scarborough Health Network
Centenary Site
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 281-7270
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 55 Mountainash Road
Osler Hyperbarics and Wound Care
Unit 23
Brampton Ontario L6R 1W4
Phone: 365-747-1470
Fax: 905-216-0594
Address: 17730 Leslie Street
York Hyperbaric Medicine Centre
Suite 112
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 4W4
Phone: 2898039119
Extension: 2
Fax: 9052351277
Address: Southlake Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
596 Davis Dr.
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 330 Highway 7 E
Digestive Health Clinic
Suite 510
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3P8
Phone: 9057075007
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6004
Fax: No Information Available
Address: N/A - House Calls
Maple
Toronto Ontario M6G2L3
Phone: 647-497-7453
Fax: 888-745-0435
Address: 340 College St
Kensington Health Clinic
Suite 601
Toronto ON M5T 3A9
Phone: 4169289511
Fax: 4169289513

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 17 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason K. Yue Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yue (CPSO#: 76401 )
Business Address: Department of Emergency Medicine
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6004
Business Address: Department of Emergency Medicine
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 281-7404
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON KEITH YUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YUE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON KEITH YUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YUE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 23 Oct 2017
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 23 Oct 2017
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001