THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 22:55:30 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Centenary Hospital
Room 3414
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Fax: (647) 493-1721
Address: Don Valley Endoscopy Centre
2175 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 308
Toronto Ontario M2J 1W8
Phone: 416-638-5889
Fax: 416-638-5043

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 21 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grover Adabachi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Adabachi (CPSO#: 90118 ) Dr. S. Grover (CPSO#: 76425 )
Business Address: Don Valley Endoscopy Centre
308 - 2175 Sheppard Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2J 1W8
(416) 638-5889
Business Address: St Michael's Hospital
Division of Gastroenterology
16-036 Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5628
Business Address: 569 King Street East
Toronto Ontario M5A 1M5
(416) 901-6672
Business Address: Humber Regional Hospital
2175 Keele Street
Toronto Ontario M6M 3Z4
(416) 249-8111

Corporation Name: Samir C. Grover Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Mar 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Centenary Hospital
Room 3414
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Fax: (647) 493-1721
Address: Don Valley Endoscopy Centre
2175 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 308
Toronto Ontario M2J 1W8
Phone: 416-638-5889
Fax: 416-638-5043

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 21 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grover Adabachi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Adabachi (CPSO#: 90118 ) Dr. S. Grover (CPSO#: 76425 )
Business Address: Don Valley Endoscopy Centre
308 - 2175 Sheppard Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2J 1W8
(416) 638-5889
Business Address: St Michael's Hospital
Division of Gastroenterology
16-036 Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5628
Business Address: 569 King Street East
Toronto Ontario M5A 1M5
(416) 901-6672
Business Address: Humber Regional Hospital
2175 Keele Street
Toronto Ontario M6M 3Z4
(416) 249-8111

Corporation Name: Samir C. Grover Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Mar 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMIR CHANDRA GROVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROVER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMIR CHANDRA GROVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROVER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001