THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:45:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 790 Bay Street
Suite 322
PO Box 11
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 598-5665
Fax: (416) 591-1162

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marshall Hay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hay (CPSO#: 76426 )
Business Address: Suite 322
790 Bay Street
PO Box 11
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
(416) 598-5665

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 790 Bay Street
Suite 322
PO Box 11
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 598-5665
Fax: (416) 591-1162

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marshall Hay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hay (CPSO#: 76426 )
Business Address: Suite 322
790 Bay Street
PO Box 11
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
(416) 598-5665

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARSHALL ALEXANDER HAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARSHALL ALEXANDER HAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001