THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:01:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CZECH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital site
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-4466
Fax: (905) 813-4128
Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
St. Joseph's Healthcare
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: 905-522-1155
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 25-1200 Main St W
Hamilton Health Sciences
McMaster Children's Hospital
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Phone: 905-521-2100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Halton Healthcare
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Phone: 905-845-2471
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 31 Aug 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jane & Paul Healey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Healey (CPSO#: 76427 ) Dr. P. Healey (CPSO#: 76068 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 338-4605
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-1100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CZECH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital site
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-4466
Fax: (905) 813-4128
Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
St. Joseph's Healthcare
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: 905-522-1155
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 25-1200 Main St W
Hamilton Health Sciences
McMaster Children's Hospital
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Phone: 905-521-2100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Halton Healthcare
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Phone: 905-845-2471
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 31 Aug 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jane & Paul Healey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Healey (CPSO#: 76427 ) Dr. P. Healey (CPSO#: 76068 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 338-4605
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-1100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANE HEALEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEALEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANE HEALEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEALEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001