THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:36:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-8272
Extension: 6212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tibbet Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Tibbet (CPSO#: 76431 )
Business Address: Toronto East General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 469-6580

Corporation Name: Juliana S. Tibbet Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Apr 2014

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-8272
Extension: 6212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tibbet Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Tibbet (CPSO#: 76431 )
Business Address: Toronto East General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 469-6580

Corporation Name: Juliana S. Tibbet Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Apr 2014

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIANA SALEM TIBBET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TIBBET is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIANA SALEM TIBBET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TIBBET is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001