THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:16:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Civic Hospital
Emergency Department
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054942120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 470 Chrysler Dr
Scope Clinic
Brampton ON L6S 6G3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 115 Humber College Blvd
Ontario Colonoscopy Clinic Corporation
Suite 715
Etobicoke ON M9V 0A9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 17 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anita Aggarwal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Feb 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Aggarwal (CPSO#: 76432 )
Business Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Attn E.R. Department
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Civic Hospital
Emergency Department
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054942120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 470 Chrysler Dr
Scope Clinic
Brampton ON L6S 6G3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 115 Humber College Blvd
Ontario Colonoscopy Clinic Corporation
Suite 715
Etobicoke ON M9V 0A9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 17 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anita Aggarwal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Feb 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Aggarwal (CPSO#: 76432 )
Business Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Attn E.R. Department
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANITA AGGARWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGGARWAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANITA AGGARWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGGARWAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001