THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:32:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 738-8400
Extension: 82730
Fax: (613) 738-8337

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 13 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ann Bugeja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bugeja (CPSO#: 76438 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
(613) 738-8400 Extn: 82730

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 738-8400
Extension: 82730
Fax: (613) 738-8337

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 13 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ann Bugeja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bugeja (CPSO#: 76438 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
(613) 738-8400 Extn: 82730

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANN LEANOR BUGEJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUGEJA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANN LEANOR BUGEJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUGEJA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001