THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:10:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Regional Hospital,
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 973-4444
Fax: (519) 973-0803
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Hotel Dieu Grace Health Care
1453 Prince Road
Windsor Ontario N9C 3Z4
Phone: 519-257-5111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin Ewing Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ewing (CPSO#: 76439 )
Business Address: 1453 Prince Road
Windsor Ontario N9C 3Z4
(519) 257-5111
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4444 Extn: 4421

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Regional Hospital,
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 973-4444
Fax: (519) 973-0803
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Hotel Dieu Grace Health Care
1453 Prince Road
Windsor Ontario N9C 3Z4
Phone: 519-257-5111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin Ewing Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ewing (CPSO#: 76439 )
Business Address: 1453 Prince Road
Windsor Ontario N9C 3Z4
(519) 257-5111
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4444 Extn: 4421

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN LINDSAY EWING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EWING is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN LINDSAY EWING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EWING is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001