THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:26:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 440 Bathurst Street
Suite 300
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-603-5888
Fax: No Information Available
Address: ICES
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room G1-06
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4055
Extension: 7665
Fax: (416) 480-6048

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Community Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Community Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey C. Kwong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kwong (CPSO#: 76444 )
Business Address: 440 Bathurst Street
Suite 300
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S6
416-603-5888 Extn: 1
Business Address: G1-06 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4055 Extn: 7665
Business Address: Family Health Centre
2W404 - 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5888 Extn: 1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 440 Bathurst Street
Suite 300
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-603-5888
Fax: No Information Available
Address: ICES
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room G1-06
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4055
Extension: 7665
Fax: (416) 480-6048

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Community Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Community Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey C. Kwong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kwong (CPSO#: 76444 )
Business Address: 440 Bathurst Street
Suite 300
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S6
416-603-5888 Extn: 1
Business Address: G1-06 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4055 Extn: 7665
Business Address: Family Health Centre
2W404 - 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5888 Extn: 1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY CHENG YU KWONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY CHENG YU KWONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001