THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:23:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
4001 Leslie Street
Room 1NE-752
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: (416) 756-6095
Address: York Radiology Consultants And York
X-Ray Management Limited
Suite 100
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
North York Ontario M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 494-8800
Fax: (416) 494-9257

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Margau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Margau (CPSO#: 76451 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
Outpatient and Community Services Centre
2 Champagne Dr
North York ON M3J 0K2
Business Address: 58 Bannatyne Drive
North York Ontario M2L 2P1
Business Address: North York General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
4001 Leslie Street
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6183

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
4001 Leslie Street
Room 1NE-752
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: (416) 756-6095
Address: York Radiology Consultants And York
X-Ray Management Limited
Suite 100
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
North York Ontario M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 494-8800
Fax: (416) 494-9257

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Margau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Margau (CPSO#: 76451 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
Outpatient and Community Services Centre
2 Champagne Dr
North York ON M3J 0K2
Business Address: 58 Bannatyne Drive
North York Ontario M2L 2P1
Business Address: North York General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
4001 Leslie Street
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6183

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RYAN MARGAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARGAU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RYAN MARGAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARGAU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001