THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:15:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 701
2197 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 518-0330
Fax: (613) 518-0331
Address: 1355 Bank St
4th Floor
Ottawa ON K1H 8K7
Phone: 613-518-0330
Fax: 613-518-0331

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 27 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Angela Montgomery Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Montgomery (CPSO#: 76469 )
Business Address: 2197 Riverside Drive
Suite 701
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7X3
(613) 518-0330
Business Address: 1355 Bank Street
4th Floor
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3W7
613-518-0330

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 701
2197 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 518-0330
Fax: (613) 518-0331
Address: 1355 Bank St
4th Floor
Ottawa ON K1H 8K7
Phone: 613-518-0330
Fax: 613-518-0331

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 27 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Angela Montgomery Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Montgomery (CPSO#: 76469 )
Business Address: 2197 Riverside Drive
Suite 701
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7X3
(613) 518-0330
Business Address: 1355 Bank Street
4th Floor
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3W7
613-518-0330

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGELA BERTI MONTGOMERY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONTGOMERY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGELA BERTI MONTGOMERY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONTGOMERY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001