THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:19:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Compass Dermatology
Units 8 and 9
650 Mount Pleasant Road
Toronto Ontario M4S 2N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 351-9277
Fax: (647) 351-9077

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 18 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Julia Carroll Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Carroll (CPSO#: 76471 )
Business Address: 650 Mount Pleasant Rd
Toronto ON M4S 2N5
6473519277

Corporation Name: Dr. Julia Carroll Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Carroll (CPSO#: 76471 )
Business Address: Compass Dermatology
Unit 8
650 Mount Pleasant Road
Toronto Ontario M4S 2N5
(647) 351-9277

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Compass Dermatology
Units 8 and 9
650 Mount Pleasant Road
Toronto Ontario M4S 2N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 351-9277
Fax: (647) 351-9077

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 18 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Julia Carroll Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Carroll (CPSO#: 76471 )
Business Address: 650 Mount Pleasant Rd
Toronto ON M4S 2N5
6473519277

Corporation Name: Dr. Julia Carroll Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Carroll (CPSO#: 76471 )
Business Address: Compass Dermatology
Unit 8
650 Mount Pleasant Road
Toronto Ontario M4S 2N5
(647) 351-9277

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIA MARIE CARROLL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARROLL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIA MARIE CARROLL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARROLL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Mar 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001