THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:08:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: L L R M Medical College, Meerut Univ, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thornhill Family Practice
Unit 35
7700 Bathurst Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 7Y3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 881-6510
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Mar 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shalini Rastogi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rastogi (CPSO#: 76477 )
Business Address: Thornhill Family Practice
35 - 7700 Bathurst Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 7Y3
(905) 881-6510

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: L L R M Medical College, Meerut Univ, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thornhill Family Practice
Unit 35
7700 Bathurst Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 7Y3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 881-6510
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Mar 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shalini Rastogi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rastogi (CPSO#: 76477 )
Business Address: Thornhill Family Practice
35 - 7700 Bathurst Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 7Y3
(905) 881-6510

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHALINI RASTOGI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASTOGI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHALINI RASTOGI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASTOGI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: L L R M Medical College, Meerut Univ, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Feb 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Mar 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Feb 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001