THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:07:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medical Associates
Lower Level Suite 100
155 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 945-5476
Fax: (905) 945-7707

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 29 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heather Roelfsema Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Roelfsema (CPSO#: 76481 )
Business Address: Medical Associates
Suite 100 Lower Level
155 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P2
(905) 945-5476

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medical Associates
Lower Level Suite 100
155 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 945-5476
Fax: (905) 945-7707

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 29 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heather Roelfsema Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Roelfsema (CPSO#: 76481 )
Business Address: Medical Associates
Suite 100 Lower Level
155 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P2
(905) 945-5476

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER JOANNA ROELFSEMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROELFSEMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER JOANNA ROELFSEMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROELFSEMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001