THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/04/25 17:59:46 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ihab Assaad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Assaad (CPSO#: 76488 )
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2200

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ihab Assaad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Assaad (CPSO#: 76488 )
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2200

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IHAB GUIRGUIS RIZK ASSAAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASSAAD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IHAB GUIRGUIS RIZK ASSAAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASSAAD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Feb 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 Apr 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Sep 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Mar 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Oct 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Feb 2007

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 Apr 2005

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Oct 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Oct 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001