THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:11:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2559 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4P 2J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-922-2000
Fax: 416-922-2005

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anisa Janmohamed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Feb 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Janmohamed (CPSO#: 76497 )
Business Address: MD-Direct
236 Aevnue Road
Suite 200
Toronto Ontario M5R 2J4
(416) 922-2000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2559 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4P 2J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-922-2000
Fax: 416-922-2005

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anisa Janmohamed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Feb 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Janmohamed (CPSO#: 76497 )
Business Address: MD-Direct
236 Aevnue Road
Suite 200
Toronto Ontario M5R 2J4
(416) 922-2000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANISA JANMOHAMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JANMOHAMED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANISA JANMOHAMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JANMOHAMED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001