THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:56:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
Department of Cardiology
P O Box 5339
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3746
Fax: (519) 663-3782
Address: London Cardiac Institute
Suite 201 - 1055 Fanshawe Park Rd W
London Ontario N6G0G4
Phone: (519) 645-0146
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 21 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leong-Sit Manlucu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Leong-Sit (CPSO#: 76500 )
Business Address: 561 Eagletrace Dr
London ON N6G 0E8
519-663-3746

Corporation Name: Leong-Sit Manlucu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
Department of Cardiology
P O Box 5339
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3746
Fax: (519) 663-3782
Address: London Cardiac Institute
Suite 201 - 1055 Fanshawe Park Rd W
London Ontario N6G0G4
Phone: (519) 645-0146
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 21 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leong-Sit Manlucu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Leong-Sit (CPSO#: 76500 )
Business Address: 561 Eagletrace Dr
London ON N6G 0E8
519-663-3746

Corporation Name: Leong-Sit Manlucu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER PAK-KIAN LEONG-SIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEONG-SIT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER PAK-KIAN LEONG-SIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEONG-SIT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001