THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:16:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: All About Health
Unit E - 1070 Major Mackenzie Drive E
Richmond Hill ON L4S 1P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 884-0666
Fax: (905) 884-5317

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Meera Selvakone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Selvakone (CPSO#: 76502 )
Business Address: 9651 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 1V7
Business Address: 1070 Major Mackenzie Dr E
Richmond Hill ON L4S 1P3
(905)884-0666

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: All About Health
Unit E - 1070 Major Mackenzie Drive E
Richmond Hill ON L4S 1P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 884-0666
Fax: (905) 884-5317

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Meera Selvakone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Selvakone (CPSO#: 76502 )
Business Address: 9651 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 1V7
Business Address: 1070 Major Mackenzie Dr E
Richmond Hill ON L4S 1P3
(905)884-0666

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEERA SELVAKONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELVAKONE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEERA SELVAKONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELVAKONE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001