THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:00:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 586 Argus Road, Suite 101
Oakville Ontario L6J 3J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 842-2410
Fax: (905) 842-7376

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Soliman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Soliman (CPSO#: 76521 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 586 Argus Road, Suite 101
Oakville Ontario L6J 3J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 842-2410
Fax: (905) 842-7376

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Soliman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Soliman (CPSO#: 76521 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHERINE SOLIMAN REZK SOLIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLIMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHERINE SOLIMAN REZK SOLIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLIMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001