THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:44:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Bombay, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, MARATHI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingsridge Drive
Oakville Ontario L6M
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054653878
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 203 Georgian Dr
Oakville ON L6H 7H9
Phone: 905 825 6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2370 Third Line
Oakville Ontario L6M 4E2
Phone: (905) 469-3294
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nikita Sheth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sheth (CPSO#: 76525 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Address: 6-2015 Kingsridge Dr
Oakville ON L6M 4Y7
9054653878

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, MARATHI
Medical School: University of Bombay, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingsridge Drive
Oakville Ontario L6M
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054653878
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 203 Georgian Dr
Oakville ON L6H 7H9
Phone: 905 825 6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2370 Third Line
Oakville Ontario L6M 4E2
Phone: (905) 469-3294
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nikita Sheth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sheth (CPSO#: 76525 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Address: 6-2015 Kingsridge Dr
Oakville ON L6M 4Y7
9054653878

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIKITA TEJ SHETH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHETH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIKITA TEJ SHETH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHETH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Bombay, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Oct 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001