THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:23:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Garyounis University, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: THE HEALTHY WAY HEAD OFFICE
1120 Finch Avenue West, Suite 106,
Toronto Ontario M3J 3H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-667-8498
Extension: Ext.1
Fax: 416-667-0334
Address: ACCURATE HEART DIAGNOSTIC CENTRE,IN
100 pertosa drive
Brampton Ontario L6X 0H9
Phone: 905-796-7333
Fax: 905-796-7370
Address: 18 Kensington Rd
501
Brampton ON L6T 4S5
Phone: 9054978177
Fax: 9054978277
Address: 320 Matheson Boulevard West
unit 101
Mississauga Ontario L5R 3R1
Phone: 6475771553
Fax: 6477776118
Address: 16700 Bayview Avenue
Advanced cardiology
16700 bayview avenue
Unit #22 Newmarket Ontario L3X 1W1
Newmarket Ontario L3X 1W1
Phone: 289 8032959
Fax: 18558701125
Address: 50 Rolling Hills Drive
unit 6
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4W2
Phone: 5193078800
Fax: 5193078801
Address: 1670 Dufferin Street
unit 208
Toronto Ontario M6H 3M2
Phone: 4166546019
Fax: 4166544505

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 21 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kilany Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kilany (CPSO#: 76526 )
Business Address: Accurate Heart Diagnostic Centre
100 Pertosa Drive
Brampton Ontario L6X 0H9
(905) 796-7333
Business Address: Dufferin Subspecialty Clinic
1664 Dufferin Street
Toronto Ontario M6H 3M1
(416) 652-6101

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Garyounis University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: THE HEALTHY WAY HEAD OFFICE
1120 Finch Avenue West, Suite 106,
Toronto Ontario M3J 3H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-667-8498
Extension: Ext.1
Fax: 416-667-0334
Address: ACCURATE HEART DIAGNOSTIC CENTRE,IN
100 pertosa drive
Brampton Ontario L6X 0H9
Phone: 905-796-7333
Fax: 905-796-7370
Address: 18 Kensington Rd
501
Brampton ON L6T 4S5
Phone: 9054978177
Fax: 9054978277
Address: 320 Matheson Boulevard West
unit 101
Mississauga Ontario L5R 3R1
Phone: 6475771553
Fax: 6477776118
Address: 16700 Bayview Avenue
Advanced cardiology
16700 bayview avenue
Unit #22 Newmarket Ontario L3X 1W1
Newmarket Ontario L3X 1W1
Phone: 289 8032959
Fax: 18558701125
Address: 50 Rolling Hills Drive
unit 6
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4W2
Phone: 5193078800
Fax: 5193078801
Address: 1670 Dufferin Street
unit 208
Toronto Ontario M6H 3M2
Phone: 4166546019
Fax: 4166544505

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 21 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kilany Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kilany (CPSO#: 76526 )
Business Address: Accurate Heart Diagnostic Centre
100 Pertosa Drive
Brampton Ontario L6X 0H9
(905) 796-7333
Business Address: Dufferin Subspecialty Clinic
1664 Dufferin Street
Toronto Ontario M6H 3M1
(416) 652-6101

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALI KUNI ABUBAKER AHMED KILANY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KILANY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALI KUNI ABUBAKER AHMED KILANY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KILANY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Garyounis University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 24 Nov 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Mar 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2001